Vedic Mathematics ppt

Vedic Mathematics ppt SlideShare Explore You Successfully reported this slideshow.Vedic Mathematics pptUpcoming SlideShareLoading in …5× 162 Comments 181 Likes Statistics Notes prathap kumar , Superintendent Engineer at ApTrans co Show More No DownloadsNo notes for slide 1. VEDIC MATHEMATICS 2. What is Vedic Mathematics ? Vedic mathematics is the name given to the ancient system…


Vedic Mathematics ppt

SlideShare Explore You

Successfully reported this slideshow.

Vedic Mathematics pptVEDIC MATHEMATICS

Learning to Teach Online

Online Course – LinkedIn Learning

  • Communication in the 21st Century Classroom

    Communication in the 21st Century Classroom

    Online Course – LinkedIn Learning

  • Office 2016 for Educators

    Office 2016 for Educators

    Online Course – LinkedIn Learning

  • Thay đổi nhỏ để thành công lớn VHN

    Vo Hieu Nghia

  • Squaring of numbers

    Krishna Kumawat

  • Global Healthcare Report Q2 2019

    CB Insights

  • Be A Great Product Leader (Amplify, Oct 2019)

    Adam Nash

  • Trillion Dollar Coach Book (Bill Campbell)

    Eric Schmidt

  • APIdays Paris 2019 – Innovation @ scale, APIs as Digital Factories’ New Machi…

    apidays

  • A few thoughts on work life-balance

    Wim Vanderbauwhede

    • English
    • Español
    • Português
    • Français
    • Deutsch

    LinkedIn Corporation © 2020

    Public clipboards featuring this slide

    No public clipboards found for this slide

    Select another clipboard

    ×

    Looks like you’ve clipped this slide to already.

    Create a clipboard

    You just clipped your first slide!

    Clipping is a handy way to collect important slides you want to go back to later. Now customize the name of a clipboard to store your clips.

    Description

    Visibility

    Others can see my Clipboard

    Source

    Vedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes [PDF Download] • Exam Tyaari

      Exam Tyaari brought you best ever vedic maths tricks handwritten notes with solved examples. This Vedic Maths tricks PDF is a compilation of all the maths topics for competitive exams. All the Topicwise Maths Tricks in a single pdf.Vedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes PDF contains…VEDIC MATHS TRICKSNUMBER SYSTEMSURDS & INDICESNUMBER SERIESEQUATIONSRATIO & ALLIGATIONAVERAGEPROFIT & LOSSTIME…

     

     Exam Tyaari brought you best ever vedic maths tricks handwritten notes with solved examples. This Vedic Maths tricks PDF is a compilation of all the maths topics for competitive exams. All the Topicwise Maths Tricks in a single pdf.
    Vedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes [PDF Download] - Exam TyaariVedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes [PDF Download] - Exam Tyaari
    Vedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes PDF contains…

    • VEDIC MATHS TRICKS
    • NUMBER SYSTEM
    • SURDS & INDICES
    • NUMBER SERIES
    • EQUATIONS
    • RATIO & ALLIGATION
    • AVERAGE
    • PROFIT & LOSS
    • TIME &WORK
    • PERMUTATION, COMBINATION
    • PROBABILITY
    • MISCELLANEOUS

    Recommended download for all the aspirants of competitive exams. It’s easy to study and well formatted. Use these Vedic Maths Tricks Notes to learn more and score high in maths.

    Must for all the SSC CGL, CPO, CHSL, SBI PO/Clerk, RRB ALP, NTPC and Group D and IBPS PO, Clerk, SIDBI, LIC, Delhi Police SI Aspirants. ALL COMPETITIVE EXAM Aspirants can use it for their preparations. Download Vocabulary notes pdf from the red button below.

     

    Details:

    • Name: Vedic Maths Tricks Handwritten Notes
    • Author: Sandeep Bohey
    • Language: English
    • Format: PDF
    • Pages: 228
    • Size: 36.4 MB
    PDF: 

    Source

    Do Super Quick Maths Calculation Using Vedic Method

    Teaching Mental Maths Tricks to Anyone and Everyone! Learning to perform fast mental maths calculation will help you immensely irrespective of which field of life you deal with.Knowing these mental maths tricks will give you a positive edge over the others.Whether you are a student,aspiring engineer,statistician,scientist,school teacher or anyone else dealing with numbers,learning this quick…


    Teaching Mental Maths Tricks to Anyone and Everyone!

    Learning to perform fast mental maths calculation will help you immensely irrespective of which field of life you deal with.Knowing these mental maths tricks will give you a positive edge over the others.Whether you are a student,aspiring engineer,statistician,scientist,school teacher or anyone else dealing with numbers,learning this quick mental tricks and techniques 

    (popularly known as Vedic Maths techniques) is always going to benefit you.

    You must have heard of Shakuntala Devi-the lady who performed maths calculations faster than a Computer,you can do it too, just with a little bit of practice.

    For example, let say you want to multiply 52*11.This can be calculated in less than 1 second but if you want to do it traditionally,it will take you around 5-6 seconds.Isn’t it?

    So let see how using a simple mental maths trick,this calculation can be done in a matter of seconds…

    To multiply 52 and 11,imagine there is a space between 52

    52*11= 5_2 (Put an imaginary space in between)

    Now,what to do with that space?

    Just add 5 and 2 and put the result in the imaginary space

    So, 52 * 11 =572 (which is your answer)

    Isn’t it great?

    Lets try some more examples:

    1) 35 * 11 = 3 (3+5) 5 = 385

    2) 81 * 11 = 8 (8+1) 1 = 891

    3) 72 * 11 = 7 (7+2) 2 = 792 etc..

    With just a little bit of practice you can easily perform these simple mental maths tricks in the blink of an eye.

    People sitting for competitive exams often complain that they could not complete the Question paper within a certain time period as the paper was too length(l)y.But for your information,let me tell you that all papers of all competitive exams are so designed that students can finish it within the given time period.Its just that student do not have the required efficiency.So in tight time constraint situation where time plays a very important role,knowing these quick mental maths techniques will give you an edge over your competitors.It will be your X-Factor.It will give you that sharpness and smartness required to crack any competitive exams.

    Lets take an example of this sum which has been taken from the 2010 question paper of a Popular Bank PO Examination (Aptitude Section):

    (Q) Is 456138 divisible by 9?

    Now, it only takes 2 seconds for you to determine the answer.But if you go by the traditional way then it will take you 10 seconds.So you can see the difference.Those 8 extra seconds you win,you can spend on other question.Isn’t it?

    No let see the solution

    (Answer) To test whether a certain large number is divisible by 9 or not,’just add all the digits of the number and if the end result is divisible by 9,then you can say that the entire large number will be divisible by 9 too‘.

    4+5+6+1+3+8=27

    Now since 27 is divisible by 9 so 456138 will be divisible by 9 too.

     By now you must have some idea, how important it is to know these mental maths tricks.Knowing these simple calculation techniques gives you an advantage over others and can get you a job,get you crack any competitive exams and much more.

    Here are few more mental maths tricks..

    Multiply any large number by 12 mentally in seconds

    To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour

    For example  21314 * 12 =  255768

    Lets break it into simple steps:

    Step 1: 021314 * 12 =  _____8 (Double of Last Digit 4= 8 )

    Step 2: 021314 * 12 =  ____68 (Now Double 1= 2, and add it to 4, 2+4=6)

    Step 3: 021314 * 12=   ___768 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 1, 6+1=7)

    Step 4: 021314 * 12=   __5768 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 2+3=5)

    Step 5: 021314 * 12=   _55768 (Now Double  2=4, and add it to 1, 4+1=5)

    Step 6: 021314 * 12=   255768 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 2, 0+2=2)

    So your final answer of 21314 * 12 = 255768

    Another example…

    Calculating Square of numbers quickly…

    Lets calculate the square of 54

      

    So (54)^2 = 5^2 +4 — 4^2 = 25 +4 —-16 =29——-16= 2916

    Similarly (55)^2 = 5^2 +5 –5^2=25+5——25=30———25= 3025

    Similarly (56)^2 = 5^2 + 6–6^2=25+6——36= 31——–36= 3136 etc..

    Similarly try out squares of 57,58 etc..

    These are just few of the manyMental Maths Trickspossible.There are numerous other maths tricks for fast calculation.If you like these mental maths tricks and feel the necessity to know all the other tricks then Download and Save the entire ‘Mental Maths Tricks’ ebook to your PC.But remember this amazing book is not free (as expected) so you will have to buy it.It has been released only a few months ago and 90000 (approx) copies has been sold already.So Hurry Up, and Download this amazing mental maths book now.

    Source