Asaan Hai. Get the latest information on what's important. We are not bound by a niche & share all that can be useful - News, Education, Recipes & lots more..

Article SummaryXTo multiply single digit numbers using vedic math, start by writing out the problem you want to solve, with 1 number on top of the other with an equation line underneath. For example, put the 6 on top of the 7 if the problem you’re working on is 6 times 7. Then, subtract each…

Article SummaryX

To multiply single digit numbers using vedic math, start by writing out the problem you want to solve, with 1 number on top of the other with an equation line underneath. For example, put the 6 on top of the 7 if the problem you’re working on is 6 times 7. Then, subtract each number from 10 and write your answers next to the relevant number. In the example, you’d write 4 next to the 6, since 10 minus 6 is 4, and 3 next to the 7, because 10 minus 7 is 3. For the next step, multiply the numbers in the right-hand column, which would be 3 times 4, equaling 12. Take the second digit from your answer, the 2, and write it below the equation line, and save the 1 for the next step. Then, subtract a right column number from the diagonal left column number. For example, do 6 minus 3 or 7 minus 4, which both equal 3. Next, add the 1 you saved from earlier to your answer, which gives you 4. Finish by writing the 4 to the left of the 2 under your equation line to get you the answer to your problem, 42. For tips on how to multiply numbers close to 100, read on!

Did this summary help you?In other languagesThanks to all authors for creating a page that has been read 209,639 times.

E-Book : VEDIC MATHEMATICS Download Free PDF BookINTRODUCTION TO VEDIC MATHEMATICSIn this chapter we just recall some notions given in the book on Vedic Mathematics written by Jagadguru Swami Sri Bharati Krsna Tirthaji Maharaja (Sankaracharya of Govardhana Matha, Puri, Orissa, India), General Editor, Dr. V.S. Agrawala. Before we proceed to discuss the Vedic Mathematics that…

E-Book : VEDIC MATHEMATICS Download Free PDF Book

INTRODUCTION TO VEDIC MATHEMATICS In this chapter we just recall some notions given in the book on Vedic Mathematics written by Jagadguru Swami Sri Bharati Krsna Tirthaji Maharaja (Sankaracharya of Govardhana Matha, Puri, Orissa, India), General Editor, Dr. V.S. Agrawala. Before we proceed to discuss the Vedic Mathematics that he professed we give a brief sketch of his heritage [51].

He was born in March 1884 to highly learned and pious parents. His father Sri P Narasimha Shastri was in service as a Tahsildar at Tinnivelly (Madras Presidency) and later retired as a Deputy Collector. His uncle, Sri Chandrasekhar Shastri was the principal of the Maharajas College, Vizianagaram and his great grandfather was Justice C. Ranganath Shastri of the Madras High Court. Born Venkatraman he grew up to be a brilliant student and invariably won the first place in all the subjects in all classes throughout his educational career. During his school days, he was a student of National College Trichanapalli; Church Missionary Society College, Tinnivelli and Hindu College Tinnivelly in Tamil Nadu. He passed his matriculation examination from the Madras University in 1899 topping the list as usual. His extraordinary proficiency in Sanskrit earned him the title “Saraswati” from the Madras Sanskrit Association in July 1899. After winning the highest place in the B.A examination Sri Venkataraman appeared for 10 the M.A. examination of the American College of Sciences, Rochester, New York from the Bombay center in 1903. His subject of examination was Sanskrit, Philosophy, English, Mathematics, History and Science. He had a superb retentive memory.

In 1911 he could not anymore resist his burning desire for spiritual knowledge, practice and attainment and therefore, tearing himself off suddenly from the work of teaching, he went back to Sri Satcidananda Sivabhinava Nrisimha Bharati Swami at Sringeri. He spent the next eight years in the profoundest study of the most advanced Vedanta Philosophy and practice of the Brahmasadhana.

Can you answer 2474 x 99 within seconds?Can you find the square of 256 without using a calculator within seconds?Yes, it’s pretty difficult to solve these above questions without a calculator within a few seconds but, by using the Vedic Math Tricks explained in this blog post would actually help you do that easily.For your…

Can you answer 2474 x 99 within seconds?

Can you find the square of 256 without using a calculator within seconds?

Yes, it’s pretty difficult to solve these above questions without a calculator within a few seconds but, by using the Vedic Math Tricks explained in this blog post would actually help you do that easily.

For your information, the book Vedic Maths was written by an Indian monk Swami Bharati Krishna Tirtha in 1965. The book talks about various mental calculation techniques to solve mathematical problems without even using a calculator.

Must Read: 4 Ultimate Active Recall Strategies for Students

So, let’s explore 5 such Vedic Math Tricks to do calculations faster than ever.

Table of Contents show

Top 5 Vedic Mathematics Tricks

Here, in this blog post, I will be including the Top 5 most popular and most useful Vedic Mathematics Tricks and explain them in details.

Trick 1: Finding the Square of Any Number

Here, we will be finding out the square of 99 by using the Vedic Tricks… Let me break the complete procedure in small-small steps:

Step 1: Choose a base closer to the given number

Here, we will choose 100 as the base (because it is closest to the 99)

Step 2: Find the difference between the given number and the base

In our case, the difference between the number and the base would be minus one i.e. -1 (99 – 100)

Step 3: Add the difference with the given number

Here, it would be 99 + (-1) = 98

Step 4: Multiply the result with the base

And, in our case, it would be 98 * 100 = 9800

Step 5: Add the multiplication of the square of the difference with the previous result

So, it would be 9800 + (-1)2 = 9800 + 1 = 9801 Hence, 992 will be equal to 9801.

Trick 2: Multiplication of Any 2 Digit Number with 11

This trick makes the multiplication of any 2 digit number with 11 very easy. You will be able to solve these types of questions within 1-2 seconds after learning this trick.

Example 1: 36 x 11

Here, you will have to keep both digits as it is and in the middle of the digits simply write their Sum.

In this case, it would be: 3 (3 + 6) 6 = 396

Note: Please note that here you don’t have to multiply the digits.

Let’s take another example here,

Example 2: 53 x 11

And, as you would have already guessed, it will be 5 (5 + 3) 3 = 583

But, it becomes a little different when the sum of the 2 digits is greater than 9.

Let’s see it by another example.

Example 3: 99 x 11

In this case, all the processes will be almost same as the previous one except you will have to write only the last digit of the sum of both digits in the middle and add 1 to the very first digit of the result.

Here’s how,

9 (9 + 9) 9 = 9 (18) 9 = (9 + 1) 8 9 = 1089

Let’s make it more clear with 1 more example,

Example 4: 67 x 11

6 (6 + 7) 7 = 6 (13) 7 = (6 + 1) 3 7 = 737

Isn’t it awesome?

Trick 3: Division of Large Number by 5

However, dividing any number which is divisible by 5 with 5 is already easy, but in this trick, I will show you how to divide any 5 digits number with 5, within seconds.

Let me break this into small steps.

Example 1: 3132 / 5

Step 1: Multiply the number with 2

In our case, it would be 3132 x 2 = 6264

Step 2: Move the decimal to the left by 1

Here, 626.4

And, believe me, this is your answer.

Let’s try another question.

Example 2: 5491 / 5

First, multiply by 2: 5491 * 2 = 10982

So, 5491 / 5 = 1098.2

Isn’t it simple?

Trick 4: Multiplication of Any Two 2 Digit Numbers (from 11 to 19)

How much time will it take you to multiply 12 x 18? Quite long, right? Here comes the trick.

Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the larger number

Here, in our case, 18 + 2 = 20

Step 2: Multiply the result by 10

20 x 10 = 200

Step 3: Multiply the unit digits of both the numbers

2 x 8 = 16

Step 4: Add both numbers (which you obtained in Step 2 and Step 3)

200 + 16 = 216 So, 12 x 18 = 216

Trick 5: Multiply Any Number with 5

This is the best trick to multiply any large or small number with 5 just within seconds. The trick works little different for the even and odd numbers.

First, we will see the Even Numbers

Multiplication of Even Numbers by 5

Just divide the number by 2 and then write 0 at the end of it.

Let me show it to you.

Example 1: 1662 x 5

First, 1662 / 2 = 831

Now, add 0, 8310, which is your answer.

Easy peasy, right?

Example 2: 1952364 x 5

1952364 / 2 = 976182

So, 1952364 * 5 = 9761820

Multiplication of Odd Numbers by 5

In the case of Odd Numbers, you will have to subtract 1 from the number before dividing with the 2, and, after that write 5 to the end of the number.

Here’s how, Example 1: 1637 x 5

First, (1637 – 1) / 2 = 1636 / 2 = 818

Now, write 5 at the end i.e. 8185

So, 1637 * 5 = 8185

That’s it.

Recommended Read: Polyvinyl Alcohol – Everything You Need to Know About

Final Words

You just saw how useful are Vedic Mathematics Tricks when it comes to the complicated Mathematical calculations without using any calculator.

It is almost impossible to mention all those tricks here in this blog post. But, you can always go for the Vedic Mathematics book on Amazon.

Now, it’s your turn.

Which Trick mentioned here did you like the most – Trick 1 or Trick 5?

Or, you may have a question/query to ask.

Either way, let me know in the comments below now.