Vedic Maths Questions and Answer

Solve the following questions:Q1. 93 * 86A. 8098B. 9098C. 7998D. 9808Sol : Option C100 -86 = 14, 100 -93 = 714 * 7 = 98 (last two digits)93-14= 86-7 =79Therefore, the correct answer is 7998Q2. 87 * 93A. 9801B. 9201C. 8091D. 8291Sol : Option C100 -87 = 13, 100 -93 = 713 * 7 =…

Solve the following questions:

Q1. 93 * 86

A. 8098

B. 9098

C. 7998

D. 9808

Sol : Option C
100 -86 = 14, 100 -93 = 7
14 * 7 = 98 (last two digits)
93-14= 86-7 =79
Therefore, the correct answer is 7998

Q2. 87 * 93imt

A. 9801

B. 9201

C. 8091

D. 8291

Sol : Option C
100 -87 = 13, 100 -93 = 7
13 * 7 = 91 (last two digits)
93-13= 87-7 = 80
Therefore, the correct answer is 8091

Q.3. 89 * 109

A. 9081

B. 9281

C. 9701

D. 9401

Sol : Option C
100 -89 = 11, 100 -109 = -9
11 * -9 = -99 (100-99=01) (last two digits) (1 borrowed)
109-11-= 89+9 =98 -1 (borrowed) = 97
Therefore, the correct answer is 9701

Q.4. 47 * 44

A. 2018

B. 2048

C. 2028

D. 2068

Sol : Option D
In this case, we can take 50, which is a sub multiple of 100 or a multiple of 10 and proceed as follows: 50 -41 = 9, 50 -43 = 7
9 * 7 = 63 (last two digits)
41-7= 43-9 = 34/2 = 17
Since 50 = 100/2, we divide the left hand side number also by 2 while retaining the right hand side. Therefore, the answer will be 2068.

Q.5. Find the square of 55

A. 2525

B. 2925

C. 3025

D. 3125

Sol : Option D
552 β‡’ (5 * 6), 25 = 3025

Q.6.Find the square of 112

A. 11244

B. 12544

C. 13544

D. 14544

Sol : Option B
(112) 2 = 112 + 12 | (12) 2 = 144 | (carry 4)44 = 12544

Q.7.51 * 27

A. 1477

B. 1277

C. 1377

D. 1777

Sol : Option C
51
27
Step 1: 1 * 7 = 07 (Write 07).
Step 2: 1 * 2 + 5 * 7 + 2 (Carried Over) = 37 (Write 7 and 3 is carried over to the next step)
Step 3: 5 * 2 + 3 (Carried Over) = 13 (Write 13 because this is the last step)
1377 is the answer.

Q8.72 * 47

A. 3284

B. 3384

C. 3464

D. 9084

Sol : Option B
72
47
Step 1: 2 * 7 = 14 (Write 4 and 1 is carried over to the next step)
Step 2: 7 * 7 + 2 Γ— 4 + 1 (Carried Over) = 58 (Write 8 and 5 is carried over to the next step)
Step 3: 7 * 4 + 5 (Carried Over) = 33 (Write 27 because this is the last step)
3384 is the answer.

Q9.62 * 43

A. 2566

B. 2466

C. 2866

D. 2666

Sol : Option D
62
43
Step 1: 2 * 3 = 6 (Write 6 which is the single digit number)
Step 2: 6 * 3 + 2 * 4 = 26 (Write 6 and 2 is carried over to the next step)
Step 3: 6 * 4 + 2 (Carried Over) = 26 (Write 26 as this is the last step).
2666 is the answer.

Q10.Find the square of 82

A. 6724

B. 6424

C. 4824

D. 8924

bimtech

Sol : Option D
(82) 2 = 82 – 18 | (18) 2 = 6724

Source

Author: Asaan Hai

Asaan Hai. Get the latest information on what's important. We are not bound by a niche & share all that can be useful - News, Education, Recipes & lots more..

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *