Tutorial 1 Use the formula ALL FROM 9 AND THE LAST FROM 10 to perform instant subtractions. For example 1000 – 357 = 643 We simply take each figure in 357 from 9 and the last figure from 10.So the answer is 1000 – 357 = 643 And thats all there is to it! This…
Use the formula ALL FROM 9 AND THE LAST FROM 10 to perform instant subtractions.
For example 1000 – 357 = 643
We simply take each figure in 357 from 9 and the last figure from 10.
So the answer is 1000 – 357 = 643
And thats all there is to it!
This always works for subtractions from numbers consisting of a 1 followed by noughts: 100; 1000; 10,000 etc.
Similarly 10,000 – 1049 = 8951
For 1000 – 83, in which we have more zeros than figures in the numbers being subtracted, we simply suppose 83 is 083.
Are you or your child struggling with Math? Would you like to have fun with Math? If yes then this course is for you! Everything you wanted to know about High-Speed Vedic Mathematics and more. This course contains over 15 hours of material on the World’s Fastest Mental Arithmetic System and over a thousand solved…
Are you or your child struggling with Math? Would you like to have fun with Math? If yes then this course is for you!
Everything you wanted to know about High-Speed Vedic Mathematics and more.
This course contains over 15 hours of material on the World’s Fastest Mental Arithmetic System and over a thousand solved examples and exercises. This will keep you occupied for over 60 topics and will add to your Math Skills and give you the competitive edge.
This course has been authored by Gaurav Tekriwal the President of The Vedic Math Forum India, which contains examples presented in detail and the methods explained beautifully. The methods have been explained in over 3 different ways through white board demonstrations, computer presentations and animations.
The Vedic Math course is sought after in the academic circuit and has been made after the author’s long experience of teaching over 4 million students in the subject across the globe.
Can you multiply 998 x 997 in five seconds?
Learn High Speed Vedic Mathematics which will enable you to calculate much faster compared to the conventional system. You will be able to do seemingly difficult calculations like 998 x 997 in split seconds which will make a remarkable difference to your confidence and self esteem. Your calculation skills will improve, you will be able to perform better and you will exuberate confidence which will blow people away.
The scope of the area which Vedic Mathematics covers is much larger than the other systems. Through Vedic Math you can do calculations in Arithmetic, Algebra and even Trigonometry for that matter and simplify and speed up calculations. The results are for you to see and people love us across the globe for adding value to them and their children.
How High Speed Vedic Math can help you
· More than 1500% times faster than normal Math: this makes it the World’s Fastest. · Eradicates fear of Math completely. So If your child has Math-Phobia High Speed Vedic Math is a Fun-Filled way to do Math and arises interest in your child. · Much Improved Academic Performance in School and Instant Results. Just see the first exercise and believe it for yourself. Go over the examples given in the tutorials you would be amazed. · Sharpens your mind, increases mental agility and intelligence. · Increases your speed and accuracy. Become a Mental Calculator yourself. · Improves memory and boosts self confidence. · Cultivates an Interest in you for numbers. · Develops your left and right sides of your brain hence using intuition and innovation. It has been noted that Geniuses have been using the right side of the brain to achieve exceptional results. · Easy to master and apply. You just need the knowledge of tables to learn this. · From 11 years upward. This course has been designed to appeal to a large cross section of the society- Students, Teachers, Parents, Professionals, Entrance Exam Aspirants, Business Men, and People who have an avid interest in Math and would like to explore something exceptional which is taking the World over by storm.
You would be learning how to speed up calculations which are stumbling blocks in mathematics. These concepts will help you in your studies for the university examinations and also for the entrance examinations you will be facing in your life.
You will be learning how to speed up Multiplication, Division, Addition, Subtraction, How to find squares in less than 5 seconds, Cubes, find Cube Roots in 3 seconds flat, Find Square Roots, Sharpen your skills of Algebraic Equations and do it mentally, Learn Divisibility rules for every number in the number system, Speed up concepts of Geometry, Find out Divisibility rules for every number in the number system, Calendars and much much more. This system will change your paradigm about mathematics and you will be able to enjoy it more than you ever did.
The course will help you to realize your hidden potential, develop your mathematical faculties and improve your academic performance drastically. Most students around the globe after going through the course tell us why aren’t these methods been taught in school? To which we answer that it we have to be realistic about our education policy in any country and understand that the current system will not change drastically to adopt a completely new way of teaching math.
In order for the ancient system of Vedic Math to become mainstream, I believe that teachers need to slowly integrate it into their curriculum and display its positive results, such as students performing better on tests due to its simplified and easy-to-understand-master and apply methods. Workshops, Seminars and Math Exhibitions on the subject will stimulate a child’s brain and invoke a Mathematical Interest in him and then more difficult higher concepts can be taught to him, as he would be in a receptive mode.
In the 15 hours of the course you will learn to speed up:- · High Speed Multiplication · Faster Division · Accelerated Addition · Instant Subtractions · Digital Roots · Algebra: Linear, Simultaneous, Quadratic and Miscellaneous Equations · Squares · Cubes · Square Roots · Cube Roots · Math Meditation – Doing Math Calculations without Pens and Paper! · Divisibility · Calendars · Pythagoras Theorem
These topics and more are taught to you in over 15 hours through WhiteBoard Demonstrations, Computer Presentations and Documentary Films. Each Topic is dealt with in Detail and several examples of various difficulty levels are solved step by step. The viewer can cover each topic in his own pace and can have the topic repeated if he needs further understanding.
The course is alive with numerous examples and practice exercises also. Each example is explained in detail for a better understanding and there are many illustrations per topic to ensure grasping of the subject.
Bonus Class Room Time, Free Phone Support.
Apart from this course, to have a high level of interactivity we offer over 3 hours of our interactive virtual classroom support where your doubts, questions will be addressed for a better level of understanding and clarity. Our Virtual Classroom is equipped with Audio-Video,Powerpoints and WhiteBoard so that a variety of explanations can be given. We will be happy to answer your questions as you dwell deeper into the subject and help you out. We will be also be happy to offer you our email, phone and chat support.
” The course is extensive material on Vedic Math. A Lot of hard work has been put to bring alive this work which is evident once you see it and this has to be appreciated. The content and the editing has been done professionally and I had an amazing viewing experience. My children loved the Multiplication methods especially squares by the duplex method. Now they can do this in till the time it takes for a dropped pin to reach the ground. Stupendous I say.”
Liam Caffrey Ireland
‘ Ancient Indian Secrets a Math Teacher should know’
Nehru Lall United Kingdom
” Great work Gaurav. Your Forum is doing a service to the society by imparting these skills to the new generation. They need this to get rid of the Math Phobia prevalent in the classrooms and I think your COURSE set fits here beautifully. The explanations offered and the repetition of the methods is good for the kids to help them grasp the method. “
Martyn Rosser Southern Pines, NC United States
” I am a Math teacher in Houston and its been two months since I learnt these methods from India with the help of the Complete High Speed Vedic Math COURSE set. I have started teaching these methods to my students who I coach and their eyes shine with excitement when I teach them these methods. They want to learn more and these teens who would rather be playing computer games request me to extend their class timings to learn these new methods. I over my 9 years of service have never experienced this ever and it is amazing that the High Speed Vedic Math system is able to do so!”
Pilip Mmillan, Jr Milwaukee, WI United States
“I think I can achieve a Grade A in my Next Math Exam. Its possible. Prof.Tekriwal’s Vedic Math Methods are out of this world. Its like Harry Potter’s Magic working with Math.”
Ronald Kaye Pontypool, Torfaen United Kingdom
” The Division Method you taught and explained is fastest. You are correct. I now can challenge my friends to get answers correct to 5 decimal places faster than me. I beat them on all counts.”
Francis Ryan Perth Western Australia Australia
” My child Vivian was Math-Phobic. When I found your website and learnt about the advantages of the COURSE set I thought it might help Vivian. It was initially very difficult to have him sit through the COURSE set. But all of a sudden when the Base Method topic was going on…something caught his attention and he sat for the full 3 hours. He sat up till late in the evening and was scribbling in his notebook which when I saw was filled up with calculations which he had solved using your Vedic Math Method. Vivian is now eager to complete the course and he thinks that these methods are friendly and would help him. Thank you Mr.Tekriwal for showing my child the way.”
William Perry Columbus, OH United States
” I am home-schooling my child. This Indian method attracted me when I did some of the tutorials given on the website. I thought it would help my son to overcome his math problems. I got the Vedic Math COURSE set and showed some of the methods. I was skeptical that this would overwhelm my child hence I thought of going over it myself first and to my amazement these COURSEs clarify the Math Concepts beautifully without any hysteria over the speed. The idea is to do the sum using the basic simple system and then if its happen in speed that’s a bonus you get. Thomas has now joined me and we solve the sums together. Sometimes he teaches me a new concept. Thankyou.”
Terrence Brannon Taylorsville, CA United States
” Its simply magical and it has introduced me to a Wonderland of Numbers”
Margaret Rittenhouse Leonia, NJ United States
” Thankyou for your permission to allow us to have a 2 hour screening of the Vedic Math System from your COURSE for our school. It was successful and the children were seen taking down notes. This is the first time we’ve ever done this and I think we would have more of such sessions in the near future. We have given assignments and project work to our students on High Speed Vedic Math which will go a long way in helping them understand the concepts.”
Alejandro Gomez Austin, TX United States
For further details you can go to http://www.vedicmathsindia.org
Sol : Option C 100 -86 = 14, 100 -93 = 7 14 * 7 = 98 (last two digits) 93-14= 86-7 =79 Therefore, the correct answer is 7998
Q2. 87 * 93
Sol : Option C 100 -87 = 13, 100 -93 = 7 13 * 7 = 91 (last two digits) 93-13= 87-7 = 80 Therefore, the correct answer is 8091
Q.3. 89 * 109
Sol : Option C 100 -89 = 11, 100 -109 = -9 11 * -9 = -99 (100-99=01) (last two digits) (1 borrowed) 109-11-= 89+9 =98 -1 (borrowed) = 97 Therefore, the correct answer is 9701
Q.4. 47 * 44
Sol : Option D In this case, we can take 50, which is a sub multiple of 100 or a multiple of 10 and proceed as follows: 50 -41 = 9, 50 -43 = 7 9 * 7 = 63 (last two digits) 41-7= 43-9 = 34/2 = 17 Since 50 = 100/2, we divide the left hand side number also by 2 while retaining the right hand side. Therefore, the answer will be 2068.
Q.5. Find the square of 55
Sol : Option D 552 ⇒ (5 * 6), 25 = 3025
Q.6.Find the square of 112
Sol : Option B (112) 2 = 112 + 12 | (12) 2 = 144 | (carry 4)44 = 12544
Q.7.51 * 27
Sol : Option C 51 27 Step 1: 1 * 7 = 07 (Write 07). Step 2: 1 * 2 + 5 * 7 + 2 (Carried Over) = 37 (Write 7 and 3 is carried over to the next step) Step 3: 5 * 2 + 3 (Carried Over) = 13 (Write 13 because this is the last step) 1377 is the answer.
Q8.72 * 47
Sol : Option B 72 47 Step 1: 2 * 7 = 14 (Write 4 and 1 is carried over to the next step) Step 2: 7 * 7 + 2 × 4 + 1 (Carried Over) = 58 (Write 8 and 5 is carried over to the next step) Step 3: 7 * 4 + 5 (Carried Over) = 33 (Write 27 because this is the last step) 3384 is the answer.
Q9.62 * 43
Sol : Option D 62 43 Step 1: 2 * 3 = 6 (Write 6 which is the single digit number) Step 2: 6 * 3 + 2 * 4 = 26 (Write 6 and 2 is carried over to the next step) Step 3: 6 * 4 + 2 (Carried Over) = 26 (Write 26 as this is the last step). 2666 is the answer.